U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-01025
  • Case Name: Quest Aviation, Inc. v. Nationair Insurance Agencies, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Leave to]
  • November 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 10, 2016: [Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 26, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 24, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 24, 2016: [Response]
  • October 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2016: [Leave to]
  • October 03, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 03, 2016: [Brief]
  • October 03, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 15, 2016: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • July 11, 2016: [Withdraw]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2016: [Stay]
  • June 06, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 06, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 03, 2016: [Compel]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 26, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 06, 2015: [Leave to]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
November, 2014
  • November 18, 2014: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.