U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04171
  • Case Name: Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe v. Gerlach et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 24, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 06, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 06, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2019: [Substitute Party]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 21, 2018: [Response]
  • November 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2018: [Stay]
  • November 01, 2018: [Brief]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 02, 2018: [Transcript]
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 09, 2018: [Declaration]
  • February 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 05, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 05, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 11, 2017: [Reply]
  • December 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response]
  • December 01, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 16, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 16, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 15, 2017: [Alter Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 28, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Certificate]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
  • August 22, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2017: [In Limine]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Letter]
  • April 13, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 30, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 30, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 30, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 30, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 30, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • March 17, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Response]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 12, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • February 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • February 10, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 09, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 06, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 31, 2015: [Letter]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Letter]
  • July 20, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 19, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2014
  • November 18, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.