U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05086
  • Case Name: Barber v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Status Report]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Status Report]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Status Report]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Response]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Remand to Agency]
  • July 30, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2014
  • November 20, 2014: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.