U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05070
  • Case Name: Sund v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Letter Sent]
May, 2016
  • May 06, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [USCA Order]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Remark]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 21, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • August 20, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 13, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 13, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • July 13, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2014
  • November 24, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.