U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04174
  • Case Name: The Evangelical Good Samaritan Society v. Valenti
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Reply]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 23, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 14, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 14, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 04, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2014
  • November 24, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.