U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05087
  • Case Name: Stickler v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Destruction of Social Security Admin Hrg Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Reply]
  • July 05, 2016: [Response]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 17, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Reply]
  • August 10, 2015: [Brief]
July, 2015
  • July 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 13, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 12, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
November, 2014
  • November 25, 2014: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.