U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cv-05078
  • Case Name: Kills In Sight v. Sutaria et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 19, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 19, 2016: [Extend]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 23, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2015: [Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 08, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Declaration]
September, 2015
  • September 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2014
  • December 01, 2014: [Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.