U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05025
  • Case Name: Gowan v. Mid Century Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 07, 2016: [Response]
  • March 04, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 25, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • February 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 23, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • February 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 08, 2016: [Reply]
  • February 05, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 04, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 03, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 02, 2016: [Response]
  • February 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 29, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • January 29, 2016: [Stay]
  • January 29, 2016: [Response]
  • January 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • January 25, 2016: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 06, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 31, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 31, 2015: [Reply]
  • December 29, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2015: [Leave to]
  • December 24, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 17, 2015: [Response]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 04, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 04, 2015: [Brief]
  • December 02, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • December 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2015: [Protective Order]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 20, 2015: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 18, 2015: [Certificate]
  • November 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [Unseal Document]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 16, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 27, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 22, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • October 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2015: [Sanctions]
  • October 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 24, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2015: [Compel]
  • August 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 12, 2015: [Certificate]
July, 2015
  • July 07, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2014
  • December 02, 2014: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.