U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05088
  • Case Name: Landrum v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Settlement Agreement]
  • November 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 12, 2018: [Response]
  • July 02, 2018: [Certificate]
  • July 02, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Compel]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 22, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2018: [Certificate]
  • May 15, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 15, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 09, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 16, 2018: [Objection]
  • March 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 05, 2018: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 14, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Stay]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 19, 2017: [Reply]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • August 16, 2017: [Leave to]
  • August 15, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 15, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 02, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • August 02, 2017: [Seal Existing Document]
  • August 02, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 01, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Designation of Expert Witness]
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 13, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2014
  • December 02, 2014: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.