U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-01026
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Legendary Leasing, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 17, 2015: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 10, 2015: [Notice]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2015: [Transcript]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 07, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • July 02, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2014
  • December 04, 2014: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.