U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04176
  • Case Name: Moore v. Carroll et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 18, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 12, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 11, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 11, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 05, 2015: [Continue]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 06, 2015: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • October 02, 2015: [Proposed Schedule]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 21, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2015: [Response]
  • July 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2015: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 23, 2015: [Return of Service Executed]
  • June 15, 2015: [Return of Service Executed]
December, 2014
  • December 04, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.