U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cv-05068
  • Case Name: Niemi et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 01, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Proposed Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 13, 2016: [PHV Fee Paid]
  • June 10, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 23, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 08, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Response to Motion]
December, 2014
  • December 08, 2014: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.