U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04178
  • Case Name: Knisley v. Lake County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2015: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 24, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 24, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 03, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 03, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 03, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 03, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2014
  • December 08, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.