U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05045
  • Case Name: United States of America, Internal Revenue Service v. Picardi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Remark]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Letter]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 23, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2014
  • December 11, 2014: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.