U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04183
  • Case Name: Gard v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 30, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 06, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 05, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 15, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • February 23, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 17, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 18, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 08, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 18, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • October 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2016: [Recusal]
  • September 02, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • August 24, 2016: [Response]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 29, 2016: [Brief]
  • July 29, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • July 29, 2016: [Objection]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 06, 2016: [Extend]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 26, 2016: [Stay]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 06, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 20, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 20, 2015: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 04, 2015: [Letter Sent]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • August 17, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Extend]
December, 2014
  • December 11, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.