U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04177
  • Case Name: Loge v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 03, 2015: [Stay]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2014
  • December 12, 2014: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.