U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05082
  • Case Name: Maples v. Safeway, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Letter Received]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 07, 2016: [Withdraw]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 20, 2016: [Brief]
  • September 20, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 20, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 03, 2016: [Brief]
  • February 03, 2016: [Affidavit]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 20, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 30, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 30, 2015: [Brief]
  • December 30, 2015: [Compel]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • December 07, 2015: [Withdraw]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 16, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 16, 2015: [Compel]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
December, 2014
  • December 17, 2014: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.