U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05091
  • Case Name: Readd v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Letter Sent]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Brief]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 23, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 19, 2015: [Dismiss]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Compel]
  • July 27, 2015: [Brief]
December, 2014
  • December 18, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.