U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04186
  • Case Name: Van Ballegooyen et al v. Brownson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • December 08, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Response]
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Discovery Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 01, 2016: [Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 09, 2016: [Response]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
  • June 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 12, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Request]
  • May 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
December, 2014
  • December 18, 2014: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.