U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04187
  • Case Name: Sioux Falls Kenworth, Inc. et al v. Isuzu Commercial Truck of America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 24, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 20, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 05, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 18, 2017: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 18, 2017: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 18, 2017: [Leave to]
  • May 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • May 09, 2017: [Affidavit]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 02, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Leave to]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 13, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 13, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2017: [Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 22, 2016: [Brief]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 15, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 13, 2016: [Objection]
  • December 02, 2016: [Declaration]
  • December 02, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 01, 2016: [New Trial]
  • December 01, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 01, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
  • December 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 29, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 28, 2016: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Leave to]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 14, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 03, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2016: [Briefing Schedule]
  • November 02, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • November 02, 2016: [Verdict]
  • November 02, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 02, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 02, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 02, 2016: [Jury Question]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 27, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 27, 2016: [Brief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Exclude]
  • October 26, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 25, 2016: [Jury List]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 19, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 18, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 17, 2016: [Objections to Deposition Designations]
  • October 17, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 17, 2016: [Brief]
  • October 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 12, 2016: [Witness List]
  • October 12, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • October 12, 2016: [In Limine]
  • October 12, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 11, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • October 11, 2016: [Jury List]
  • October 11, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 11, 2016: [Pretrial Submissions]
  • October 11, 2016: [In Limine]
  • October 11, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 11, 2016: [Witness List]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 16, 2016: [Transcript]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 10, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 10, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 10, 2016: [Brief]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 25, 2016: [Brief]
  • February 25, 2016: [Response]
  • February 25, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2016: [Received]
  • January 21, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 21, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 21, 2016: [Exclude]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 13, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Brief]
  • November 12, 2015: [Quash]
  • November 10, 2015: [Return of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 31, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 27, 2015: [Withdraw]
  • August 26, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2014
  • December 18, 2014: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.