U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:14-cv-04192
  • Case Name: Eiler v. Avera McKennan Hospital et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 04, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 04, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 12, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 12, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 20, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • April 19, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 19, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Remark]
  • October 13, 2015: [Extend]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Stay]
  • September 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2014
  • December 23, 2014: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.