U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05093
  • Case Name: Dillon v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 14, 2015: [USCA Order]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [USCA Order]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Supplement]
  • June 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 15, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 12, 2015: [Brief]
  • June 12, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
December, 2014
  • December 29, 2014: [Report and Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.