U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05095
  • Case Name: Walker v. Rabern
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2015: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
December, 2014
  • December 31, 2014: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.