U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05002
  • Case Name: Trimble v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Form 52 Report]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 31, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 10, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Response]
  • February 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 09, 2016: [Response]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Response]
  • September 17, 2015: [Reply]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 16, 2015: [Protective Order]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Stipulation]
July, 2015
  • July 16, 2015: [Leave to]
  • July 16, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 07, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 07, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Extend]
  • June 17, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 17, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 17, 2015: [Response]
January, 2015
  • January 07, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.