U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05004
  • Case Name: Double H Masonry, Inc. v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (Electronic Transfer)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • April 07, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2017: [Response]
  • March 13, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2017: [Change Venue]
  • February 27, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Response]
  • February 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 02, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Reply]
  • November 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Response]
  • November 04, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2016: [Joinder]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 26, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2016: [Response]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 17, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 13, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • October 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • September 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 11, 2016: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 08, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 05, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 05, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • August 01, 2016: [Leave to]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • July 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Status Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 11, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 02, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • April 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Status Report]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Status Report]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order]
  • October 28, 2015: [Response]
  • October 23, 2015: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 21, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 02, 2015: [Leave to]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Response]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 18, 2015: [Response]
  • September 16, 2015: [Leave to]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • August 28, 2015: [Discovery]
  • August 28, 2015: [Strike]
  • August 28, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 26, 2015: [Brief]
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 28, 2015: [Notice]
  • July 28, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 27, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 23, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 21, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 09, 2015: [Extend]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
January, 2015
  • January 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.