U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05083
  • Case Name: Washington v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2015
  • January 09, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.