U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:14-cv-05094
  • Case Name: American Horse v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 08, 2015: [Hearing]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response]
  • December 04, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Mail Returned]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Reply]
  • July 02, 2015: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
  • July 02, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2015
  • January 09, 2015: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.