U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-04137
  • Case Name: Barth v. Hawkins, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 21, 2015: [Extend]
  • August 05, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • August 04, 2015: [Seal Existing Document]
  • August 03, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 03, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
January, 2015
  • January 15, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.