U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04005
  • Case Name: Gill v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 20, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 21, 2016: [Extend]
  • July 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Brief]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • April 05, 2016: [Extend]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2016: [Reply]
  • March 02, 2016: [Extend]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 18, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • February 18, 2016: [Brief]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 15, 2015: [Extend]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 30, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 30, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 20, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 27, 2015: [Objection]
  • October 16, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2015: [Protective Order]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2015
  • July 10, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 06, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2015
  • January 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.