U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01001
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Flemmer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 06, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [USCA Order]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • June 24, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
January, 2015
  • January 22, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.