U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cv-04037
  • Case Name: Lagler v. Zurich American Insurance Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 21, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Form 52 Report]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 08, 2018: [Reopen Case]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
January, 2015
  • January 22, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.