U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04040
  • Case Name: Dewey v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Certificate]
  • January 29, 2016: [Witness List]
  • January 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2016: [Designation of Expert Witness]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Designation of Expert Witness]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2015
  • January 26, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.