U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05003
  • Case Name: South Dakota Board of Regents v. Global Synthetics Environmental, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • January 31, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Statement]
  • September 29, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 29, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 27, 2017: [Response]
  • September 21, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • February 03, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • February 03, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Response]
  • February 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 18, 2017: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 18, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 12, 2017: [Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 29, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 28, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 28, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 28, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 22, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2016: [Reply]
  • December 13, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 21, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • September 02, 2016: [Discovery Report]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
  • June 17, 2016: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • June 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 13, 2016: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2016: [Third Party Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 01, 2016: [Joinder]
  • June 01, 2016: [Leave to]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 19, 2016: [Joinder]
  • May 17, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2016: [Leave to]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Return of Service Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 19, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
January, 2015
  • January 26, 2015: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.