U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05008
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Big Crow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 19, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • January 15, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 15, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Decree of Sale]
  • November 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Notice]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Mail Returned]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • October 28, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Discovery Report]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Stay]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 02, 2016: [Stay]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 02, 2016: [Stay]
  • May 02, 2016: [Mail Returned]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 26, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order for Form 52]
  • March 29, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2015
  • February 03, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.