U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05007
  • Case Name: Palomarez v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Letter Sent]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • August 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
  • March 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 07, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Letter Received]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • March 22, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • March 17, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 14, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 10, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • March 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 07, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 29, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 24, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 22, 2016: [Hearing]
  • February 22, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2016: [Settlement]
  • February 08, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 05, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 01, 2016: [Affidavit]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 25, 2016: [Objection]
  • January 20, 2016: [Letter Received]
  • January 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • November 12, 2015: [Affidavit]
  • November 09, 2015: [Hearing]
  • November 02, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • November 02, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 25, 2015: [Letter Sent]
  • October 25, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • October 25, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 15, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 13, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 09, 2015: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Request]
  • August 13, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 13, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Letter Received]
February, 2015
  • February 03, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.