U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04046
  • Case Name: Harlan v. United States et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • July 19, 2016: [Reply]
  • July 08, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2016: [Response]
  • June 13, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 13, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 13, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 13, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 13, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Affidavit in Support]
  • May 23, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 22, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2015
  • February 06, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.