U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04048
  • Case Name: Hicks v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • September 19, 2016: [Recusal]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 24, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Strike]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Reply]
  • February 22, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Certificate]
  • February 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 19, 2016: [Reply]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 27, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • January 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • January 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Response]
  • December 17, 2015: [Letter]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 14, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 14, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 09, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 09, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Compel]
  • September 28, 2015: [Request]
  • September 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 04, 2015: [Certificate]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2015: [Request]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 29, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2015
  • February 09, 2015: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.