U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04051
  • Case Name: Sprint Communications Company L.P. et al v. Wynne et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 24, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2016: [Letter]
  • June 14, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 14, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 15, 2016: [USCA Order]
September, 2015
  • September 04, 2015: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 02, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2015
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Leave to]
  • June 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 19, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
February, 2015
  • February 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.