U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cv-05025
  • Case Name: Capps et al v. Olson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2015
  • February 12, 2015: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.