U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cv-03023
  • Case Name: Heldt et al v. Payday Financial, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 06, 2016: [Brief]
  • May 06, 2016: [Dismiss Party]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2016: [Stay]
  • February 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • February 11, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 08, 2016: [Status Report]
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice]
  • February 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 08, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2016: [Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 31, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 30, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 18, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 17, 2015: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 17, 2015: [Oral Order]
  • December 17, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • December 17, 2015: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 17, 2015: [Objection]
  • December 17, 2015: [Declaration]
  • December 16, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 16, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice]
  • December 15, 2015: [Objection]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 07, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 07, 2015: [Intervene]
  • December 07, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • December 02, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 01, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 18, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 18, 2015: [Proposed Order]
  • November 18, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2015: [File Excess Pages]
  • November 18, 2015: [Intervene]
  • November 18, 2015: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order]
  • November 18, 2015: [Letter Received]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 06, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 05, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice]
  • November 04, 2015: [Settlement]
  • November 04, 2015: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2015
  • February 12, 2015: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.