U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-03003
  • Case Name: Lindholm et al v. BMW of North America, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 03, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 03, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 31, 2016: [Court Reporter Information]
  • August 30, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Letter]
  • July 05, 2016: [Letter]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 28, 2016: [Brief]
  • June 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 13, 2016: [Certificate]
  • June 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Transcript]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Costs]
  • April 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Certificate]
  • March 22, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 14, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 23, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 23, 2016: [Costs]
  • February 23, 2016: [Compel]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 02, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • February 02, 2016: [Reply]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Certificate]
  • January 19, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • January 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Brief]
  • December 30, 2015: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • December 30, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 30, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 18, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 18, 2015: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • December 11, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 07, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2015: [Response to Motion]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2015: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 13, 2015: [Compel]
  • November 05, 2015: [Designation of Expert Witness]
February, 2015
  • February 12, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.