U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cv-03018
  • Case Name: Dillon v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 17, 2015: [Stay]
October, 2015
  • October 05, 2015: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
February, 2015
  • February 12, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.