U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05010
  • Case Name: White Horse v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Reconsideration]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • February 08, 2016: [Reply to Motion Response]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Recusal]
February, 2015
  • February 23, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.