U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05011
  • Case Name: Jockish v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Transcript of Social Security Admin Hrg Received]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 23, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 07, 2016: [Transcript - Social Security Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Brief]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • August 10, 2015: [Brief]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Brief]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
February, 2015
  • February 24, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.