U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05012
  • Case Name: Leichtnam v. American Zurich Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 01, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 01, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Response]
  • October 15, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 26, 2019: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 06, 2019: [Extend]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 01, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • April 15, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • April 05, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 03, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • April 03, 2019: [Brief]
  • April 01, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Certificate]
  • March 29, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 29, 2019: [Brief]
  • March 29, 2019: [Compel]
  • March 29, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 29, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 28, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 28, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 12, 2019: [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Brief]
  • January 23, 2019: [Leave to]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 12, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order]
  • October 01, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 28, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • September 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 06, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • June 13, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Quash]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 22, 2018: [Brief]
  • January 08, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 19, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • December 18, 2017: [Compel]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • August 03, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • October 02, 2015: [Stipulation]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2015: [Form 52 Report]
February, 2015
  • February 27, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.