U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04057
  • Case Name: Adams v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 25, 2017: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: [Letter Sent]
  • November 01, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • July 29, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 27, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Reply]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 06, 2015: [Extend]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Extend]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 27, 2015: [Response to Motion to Vacate (28:2255)]
  • August 27, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 19, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [Declaration]
March, 2015
  • March 10, 2015: [Order to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.