U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01019
  • Case Name: Gesinger v. Burwell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Settlement Agreement]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [In Limine]
  • November 18, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 18, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [Memorandum Letter]
  • November 03, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 25, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 25, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 25, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 24, 2016: [Proposed Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response]
  • July 13, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 01, 2016: [Extend]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 10, 2016: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 10, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2015
  • March 17, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.