U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01020
  • Case Name: Griffith v. City of Watertown
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 23, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 22, 2016: [Extend Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 01, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2015
  • July 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2015: [Extend Deadlines]
March, 2015
  • March 19, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.