U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05020
  • Case Name: White Face v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [USCA Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 23, 2015: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 23, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 23, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 23, 2015: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
March, 2015
  • March 20, 2015: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.