U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-04062
  • Case Name: Slattery v. Sioux Falls Ambulance, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 08, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 06, 2016: [Certificate]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • December 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 18, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2015
  • March 23, 2015: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.